Amazing Number Nine

IT IS VERY INTERESTING TAKE ANY NUMBER OF DIGITS. HERE I AM TAKING 25 AND 32

  • YOU CAN WRITE THEM IN FOUR WAYS LIKE THAT (25*32 | 25*23 | 52*23 | 52*32)

25\ast 32=800

25\ast 23=575

52\ast 23=1196

52*32=1664

  • SUBTRACT BIGGER ONE TO ANY LOWER, ONE BY ONE

1664-1196=468 | 468=4+6+8=­18  | 18=1+8=9

1664-575=1089 \quad |\quad 1089=1+0+8+­9=18 \quad |\quad 18=1+8=9

1164-800=864 \quad |\quad 864=8+6+4=1­8 \quad |\quad 18=1+8=9

1196-575=621 \quad |\quad 621=6+2+1=9

1196-800=396\quad |\quad 396=3+6+9=1­8 \quad |\quad 18=1+8=9

 800-575=225\quad |\quad 225=2+2+5=9

Always THE SUM IS 9. IT IS TRUE FOR ANY DIGITS..

Here are some amazing numbers

A.

  • 26*22*1.75=1001
  • 26*22*3.5=2002
  • 26*22*5.25=3003
  • 26*22*7=4004
  • 26*22*8.75=5005
  • 26*22*10.5=6006
  • 26*22*12.25=7007
  • 26*22*14=8008
  • 26*22*15.75=9009
  • 26*22*17.5=10010

C.

  • 26*22*5.25=3003
  • 26*22*10.5=6006
  • 26*22*15.75=9009
  • 26*22*21=12012
  • 26*22*26.25=15015
  • 26*22*31.5=18018
  • 26*22*36.75=21021
  • 26*22*42=24024
  • 26*22*47.25=27027
  • 26*22*52.5=30030

B.

 

  • 26*22*3.5=2002
  • 26*22*7=4004
  • 26*22*10.5=6006
  • 26*22*14=8008
  • 26*22*17.5=10010
  • 26*22*21=12012
  • 26*22*24.5=14014
  • 26*22*28=16016
  • 26*22*31.5=18018
  • 26*22*35=20020

D.

  • 26*22*7=4004
  • 26*22*14=8008
  • 26*22*21=12012
  • 26*22*28=16016
  • 26*22*35=20020
  • 26*22*42=24024
  • 26*22*49=28028
  • 26*22*56=32032
  • 26*22*63=36036
  • 26*22*70=40040

One Comment Add yours

  1. SUNIL KUMAR CHAWLA says:

    It’s amazing to know new ways of numbers and theorems ;

    Like

Leave a Reply

Fill in your details below or click an icon to log in:

WordPress.com Logo

You are commenting using your WordPress.com account. Log Out /  Change )

Google photo

You are commenting using your Google account. Log Out /  Change )

Twitter picture

You are commenting using your Twitter account. Log Out /  Change )

Facebook photo

You are commenting using your Facebook account. Log Out /  Change )

Connecting to %s